THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:04:06 AM
Hussein, Mohammed Hammodi
CPSO#:
82315
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Apr 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED HAMMODI HUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2014 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Sep 2013
Summary:
On September 23, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mohammed Hussein committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all those circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hussein admitted the allegation.
Dr. Hussein provided incorrect, untrue and inaccurate information in his application for a certificate of registration with the College, and in his application for a provisional licence with the Newfoundland Medical Board, in the following respects:
(a) He was not in continuous practice between 1995 and 2000;
(b) He was not practising medicine in Iraq between 1995 and 2000;
(c) He declared that the answers he gave to the questions in the applications were true, complete and without the intent to mislead.
In his application to the College, he also failed to disclose that he discontinued his medical practice for over one year.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
( the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hussein's certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Hussein shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's individualized instruction in professionalism and medical ethics on the next available date, and provide proof thereof to the College.
( Dr. Hussein appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
( Dr. Hussein pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 23, 2013