THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:58:48 AM
Bass, Catharine Joan
CPSO#:
82312
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
GD
21 Canadian Forces Health Services
309 Heritage Boulevard
PO Station Main
Lazo BC V0R 2K0
Phone: 250 339-8211 Ext. 6042
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Feb 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHARINE JOAN BASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2005 to 31 May 2005
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2008 |