THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:00:11 PM
Gringorten, Natalie Aviva
CPSO#:
82296
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V1R8
Phone: 416 494 2120
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. N. Gringorten Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:28 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIE AVIVA GRINGORTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRINGORTEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 23 Jun 2005
PEAP - R - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2005 to 06 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2006 |