THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:31:53 PM
Tandon, Vikas
CPSO#:
82290
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor Room F543
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 31378
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIKAS TANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 11 Apr 2005 to 06 May 2005
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2007 to 14 Dec 2007
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 05 Sep 2008
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |