THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:54:05 PM
Chen, Shin-Yee
CPSO#:
82282
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Mar 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON L4M 0H9
Phone: 7057214422
Fax: 7057215577
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIN-YEE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2005 to 30 Apr 2005
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |