THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:20:27 PM
Harrington, Brian David
CPSO#:
82267
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6507
Fax: (705) 740-6891
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN DAVID HARRINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRINGTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 04 Apr 2005 to 12 May 2005
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 13 May 2005 to 16 Jun 2005
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |