THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:22:14 AM
Udoeyop, Emmanuel Jonathan
CPSO#:
82259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ibibio, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-4805
Fax: (905) 697-1259
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: December 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 28, 2017, Lakeridge Health notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Emmanuel Udoeyop has voluntarily agreed, during the course of a review of his practice by Lakeridge Health, not to practise colposcopy and to review his surgical cases with the Chief of Obstetrics and Gynecology at Lakeridge Health.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:29 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL JONATHAN UDOEYOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOEYOP is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 11 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2024 |