THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:14:03 PM
Palma, David Anthony
CPSO#:
82253
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 May 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd. E.
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY PALMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Mar 2005 to 08 Apr 2005
EL - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
EL - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2010 |