THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:17:53 PM
Soares, Claudio
CPSO#:
82250
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Adult Psychiatry
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7839
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 07 Aug 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Nov 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |