THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:07:03 PM
Iskhakova, Maria Aleksandrovna
CPSO#:
82239
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ishakova, Maria Aleksandrovna (used until: 16 Nov 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Kyrgyz State Medical Academy, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1340 Huron Street
Kensington Village Care Homes
Transitional/Restorative Care Unit,
London ON N5V 3R3
Phone: 519-455-3910 Ext. 274
Fax: 519-455-1570
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA ALEKSANDROVNA ISKHAKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISKHAKOVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 09 May 2005
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 10 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 30 Oct 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 21 Jan 2007 to 29 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 30 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2008 |