THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:52:43 PM
Ben Issa, Entisar Milad
CPSO#:
82223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3447 Cawthra Rd
Mississauga ON L5A 2X9
Phone: 9057660616
Fax: 6474177042
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ENTISAR MILAD BEN ISSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN ISSA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 27 Apr 2005
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)