THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:42:06 PM
Habibi, Mehri
CPSO#:
82222
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1502
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3600 Ext. 33554
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEHRI HABIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIBI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 23 May 2005
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 24 May 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2010 |