THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:17:06 PM
Latif, Shazia
CPSO#:
82210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
1225 Maple Avenue
Milton ON L9T 0A5
Phone: (905) 693-6400
Fax: (905) 693-6405
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Feb 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAZIA LATIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATIF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2005 to 21 May 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 May 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Apr 2022 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2022 |