THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 3:00:35 AM
Paul, John Thomas
CPSO#:
82208
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Georgetown University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Oshawa Clinic
Business Office
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Date Received: 25 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |