THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:38:48 AM
Oprea, Petra
CPSO#:
82200
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
181 Greenlane East, unit 2
East Gwillimbury ON L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 May 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETRA OPREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OPREA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2005 to 18 May 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 May 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2008 |