THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:00:50 AM
Alikouzehgaran, Maryam
CPSO#:
82179
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Alberta Hospital Edmonton
PO Box 307
Edmonton AB T5J 2J7
Phone: (780) 342-5465
Fax: (780) 342-5411
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2005 to 05 Apr 2005
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Feb 2010 |
|
Active |