THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:45:54 PM
Lortie, Karine Josee
CPSO#:
82165
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Fax: (613) 830-1901
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:22 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARINE JOSEE LORTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORTIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2009 |