THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:46:44 AM
Kashanian, Behnam
CPSO#:
82136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Nov 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEHNAM KASHANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHANIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Mar 2005
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2019 |