THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:59:06 PM
Lagare, Bahubali Dhananjay
CPSO#:
82108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi, Urdu
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
377 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON L5A 3Y1
Phone: (905) 896-3777
Fax: (905) 896-7847
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
West Park Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BAHUBALI DHANANJAY LAGARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGARE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jan 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2006 |