THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:06:21 AM
Mazzadi, Sergio Angel
CPSO#:
82104
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bulgarian, English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32076
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Apr 2024 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:11 Apr 2024 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 26 Mar 2005
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 27 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 10 May 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Mar 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 May 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2024 |
|
Active |