THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:14:04 AM
Gofeld, Michael
CPSO#:
82088
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: National Medical University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240 Duncan Mill Rd
Revolution Physio
Unit 800
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 6477404541
Fax: 905-597-8994
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:10 Nov 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pain Medicine |
Effective:10 Nov 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 10 Feb 2005
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2016 |
|
Active |