THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:33:41 AM
Diaconita, Mariana
CPSO#:
82078
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane St Unit5
Toronto ON M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 249-8000
Fax: (416) 249-4594
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIANA DIACONITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIACONITA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2006 |