THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:35:53 AM
Chand, Pavanjeet
CPSO#:
82077
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Punjab University India, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Amherstburg Family Health Team
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON N9V 0B4
Phone: 519 736 7770
Fax: 519 736 7702
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAVANJEET CHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2007 |