THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:07:10 PM
Goonetillake, Piyanthi
CPSO#:
82075
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Feb 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala
Education: University of Ruhuna, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-1314
Fax: (905) 693-8892
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jan 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PIYANTHI GOONETILLAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOONETILLAKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2005 to 25 Apr 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |