THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:17:28 PM
Morgan, Magid Habib Abdou
CPSO#:
82073
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2242
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:29 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAGID HABIB ABDOU MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Feb 2005
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |