THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:25:23 PM
Cheema, Waqar Mustafa
CPSO#:
82070
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: King Edward Medical College, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3 - 511 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton ON L6Y 0N2
Phone: 9054507427
Fax: 9054502535
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Mar 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WAQAR MUSTAFA CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2007 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)