THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:06:15 AM
Chandran, Vinod
CPSO#:
82062
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: Calicut University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 1E 416
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5192
Fax: (416) 603-9387
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:01 Oct 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2004 to 10 Feb 2005
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
|
Active |