THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:59:50 AM
Loy Son, Glenn Gordon
CPSO#:
82056
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4 - 46
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J5
Phone: (519) 767-5163
Fax: (519) 767-5167
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GLENN GORDON LOY SON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOY SON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |