THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:01:35 PM
Meshrki, Hanan Shaker Daoud
CPSO#:
82055
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Asyut University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9-B
211 Martindale Rd
St Catharines ON L2S 3V7
Phone: 9056462444
Fax: 9056469099
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANAN SHAKER DAOUD MESHRKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESHRKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2005 |