THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:21:31 PM
Sabbagh, Robert
CPSO#:
82047
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:11 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2021 |