THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:05:14 PM
Werneck, Christiane Campolina Furquim
CPSO#:
82044
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-1884
Fax: (905) 848-6360
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:08 Dec 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2004 to 06 Feb 2005
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
|
Active |