THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:02:29 AM
Syslak, Paul Henrik
CPSO#:
82025
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 56576
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Nov 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 29 Apr 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 29 Apr 2011 |
|
Active |