THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:44:57 PM
Dhalla, Mohsin Nisarhusein
CPSO#:
82017
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu
Education: Queen's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1575 Upper Ottawa St
Unit A5
Hamilton ON L8W 3E2
Phone: (905) 578-5776
Fax: (905) 578-5779
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHSIN NISARHUSEIN DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2023 |