THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:53:28 PM
Gebeyehu, Yidersal Mellese
CPSO#:
82015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English
Education: Jimma University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
New Vision Family Health Team
Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Oct 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YIDERSAL MELLESE GEBEYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEBEYEHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2004 to 22 Jan 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jan 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2006 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective August 16, 2019, Dr. Gebeyehu has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)