THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:14:19 AM
Kumar, Naresh
CPSO#:
82009
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Healthline Medical Centre
Unit 3
150 Yellow Avens Blvd
Brampton ON L6R 0M5
Phone: (905) 789-9100
Fax: (905) 789-9155
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. N. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Oct 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2004 to 22 Jan 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jan 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2006 |