THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:32:27 AM
Wong, Amy Hong
CPSO#:
81998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: New York College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 18
16945 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON L3Y 9A2
Phone: (905) 868-8689
Fax: (905) 868-9479
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMY HONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2004 to 17 Nov 2004
EL - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |