THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:22:23 AM
Alavi, Shazia
CPSO#:
81994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON N1R 3H7
Phone: 5196234200
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Oct 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAZIA ALAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 18 Oct 2004 to 10 Jan 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 11 Jan 2005 to 17 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 18 Oct 2005 to 17 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2006 |