THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:17:47 AM
Bayliss, Michael Lewis
CPSO#:
81986
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1000 Middlegate Rd
Second Floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M4
Phone: 905-804-7000
Fax: 905-804-2250
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEWIS BAYLISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLISS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
EL - Neurology
McMaster University, 11 Apr 2005 to 30 Apr 2005
EL - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 31 May 2006
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2010 |