THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:46:58 AM
Salam, Abdul
CPSO#:
81954
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4163
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Sep 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDUL SALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2006 |