THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:15:08 AM
Adil, Aliya
CPSO#:
81951
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Sind, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A+Medical Centre & Walk-In
1079 Maple Ave
Milton ON L9T 0A5
Phone: (905) 864-9008
Fax: (905) 864-9004
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Sep 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALIYA ADIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2006 |