THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:04:41 PM
Francis, Amira Helmy
CPSO#:
81944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
unit 15
5731 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y9
Phone: (905) 264-8082
Fax: 855-750-8833
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Sep 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIRA HELMY FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2006 |