THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:30:34 AM
Maximous, Emad Fahim
CPSO#:
81942
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45561
Fax: (905) 323-3800
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMAD FAHIM MAXIMOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXIMOUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |