THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:59:42 PM
Jensen, Paul
CPSO#:
81938
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P. Jensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:23 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2005 |