THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:25:52 AM
Hashemzadeh Balouchi, Maliheh Ali
CPSO#:
81937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Dec 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
York Health Centre
Suite 302
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Phone: (289) 809-3131
Fax: (289) 809-3132
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MALIHEH ALI HASHEMZADEH BALOUCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHEMZADEH BALOUCHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2004 to 26 Dec 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Dec 2004 to 03 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2006 |