THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:09:24 AM
Seegobin, Ramesh
CPSO#:
81933
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit B6
3300 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON L4K 5Z2
Phone: (905) 303-2229
Fax: (905) 303-0437
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMESH SEEGOBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEGOBIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2004 to 26 Dec 2004
PEAP - R - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2007 |