THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:38:15 PM
Adetola, Ejibunmi Olubusola
CPSO#:
81929
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: Olabisi Onabanjo University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. MJ Adetola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. EO Adetola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1866 McAra Street
Regina, Sk
S4N 6C4
Date Received: 01 Sep 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2020 |