THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:18:38 AM
Daley, Scott Edward
CPSO#:
81922
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Englehart and District Hospital |
Englehart |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:11 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT EDWARD DALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Sep 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
EL - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2005 |