THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:54:54 PM
Jain, Shalini
CPSO#:
81920
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeview Medical
Unit Q
6 Speers Boulevard
Amherstview ON K7N 1Z6
Phone: (613) 634-9597
Fax: (613) 634-1668
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHALINI JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Apr 2005 to 26 Jun 2005
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 29 May 2006 to 28 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 29 May 2007 to 11 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2007 |