THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 14:07:13 PM
Jeyaraj, Leo Muthusamy
CPSO#:
81918
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Madurai Kamaraj University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Dept of Anesthesiology and Pain Med
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 14576
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 17 Sep 2004 to 17 Oct 2004
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2004 to 16 Sep 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
|
Active |