THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:37:26 AM
Numair, Huma Naheed
CPSO#:
81890
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Dec 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-3437 Ext. 2040
Fax: (905) 639-0608
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUMA NAHEED NUMAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUMAIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 02 Nov 2004
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 03 Nov 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2006 |